+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Public Health
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On November 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor