+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On July 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Reported engrossed
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Statement(s) submitted
- Statement(s) submitted
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
On July 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On July 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor