+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor