+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor