+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (57)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to committee
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Point of order sustained
- Read 2nd time
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Referred to Environmental Regulation
- Read first time
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment amended
- Amendment amended
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment amended
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Motion to table fails
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Reported engrossed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Record vote
- Amendment amended
- Amendment to amendment offered
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate