+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/21
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/3/2021
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/30/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
- Read first time
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor