+ − Actions (39)
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce
- Read first time
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor