+ − Actions (55)
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor