+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor