+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
- Received from the Senate
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor