+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 1/1/14
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate