+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor