+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor