+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Posting rule suspended
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate