+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (74)
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to committee
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Motion to table fails
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Motion to table fails
- Point of order sustained
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment amended
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment amended
On May 24, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn from schedule
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate