+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate