+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/3/2019
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor