+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Placed on intent calendar
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor