+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/13
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Public Health
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor