+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor