+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor