+ − Actions (46)
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/09
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor