+ − Actions (44)
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Safety
- Read first time
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On March 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor