+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Co-author authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Reported engrossed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate