+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 24, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Co-author authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate