+ − Actions (43)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/09
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor