+ − Actions (19)
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor