+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (133)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Motion fails
- Motion to instruct conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requests conference committee
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
- Senate refuses to concur
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment withdrawn
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Motion to table fails
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Record vote
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Point of order overruled (amendment)
- Point of order overruled (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate