+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- See remarks for effective date
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment amended
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Passed as amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 24, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor