+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor