+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (155)
Type:
Primary Sponsor