+ − Actions (46)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor