+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor