+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Higher Education
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor