+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/12/2019
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor