+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor