+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate