+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Open Government
- Read first time
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor