+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/1/2019
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor