+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
- Read first time
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate