+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 19, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/8/2019
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to State Affairs
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/9/2019
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor