+ − Actions (44)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 25, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate