+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate