+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor