+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/14/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate