+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor