+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Read 2nd time
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Point of order withdrawn
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Point of order withdrawn
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate