+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Filed without the Governor's signature
- Effective immediately
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/4/2021
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/29/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Read first time
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Governor
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor