+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor