+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendations filed with the Senate
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/25/2019
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate